MD HB1248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain law enforcement agencies to report by March 1, 2022, and each March 1 thereafter, certain information to the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services regarding police officer-involved use of force incidents that resulted in a monetary settlement or judgment against the law enforcement agency; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to adopt certain procedures and compile and report certain information to the General Assembly by June 30 each year; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Police Officer - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-21) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {318071/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-16) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {232719/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Demographics
Electronic Government
Law Enforcement
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Reports
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Data
Demographics
Electronic Government
Law Enforcement
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |