MD HB1247 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Howard County to grant, by law, a property tax credit, equal to 100% of any rate increase that exceeds $1.014 for each $100 of assessment, against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling if the dwelling is owned by an individual who is at least 65 years old, has resided in the dwelling for 30 consecutive years, and whose combined income does not exceed $75,000; and authorizing the governing body of Howard County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the credit.
Title
Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Elderly Persons
Howard County
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Residency
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Howard County
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Residency
Residential Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |