MD HB1246 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the vehicle excise tax credit for the purchase of certain plug-in electric drive vehicles to include the purchase of certain fuel cell electric vehicles; providing for the credit for a plug-in electric drive vehicle and a fuel cell electric vehicle; prohibiting a person from selling hydrogen as a motor fuel in the State if the hydrogen was produced by natural gas reforming; altering the name, membership, and required activities of the Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Cars Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-27) (Y: 107 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-4) (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-26) (Y: 113 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {173724/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (39-92) (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (43-2)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (107-27)
2019-04-05HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSenators Feldman, Beidle, and Hershey
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-04-03HouseDelegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, and Stein
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-03HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (41-4)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {767672/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-21SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (112-26)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {173724/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (39-92)
2019-03-16HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Beitzel) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {700418/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1246&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1246f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1246t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1246e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_213_hb1246e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1246_17372401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1246_70041801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1246_76767201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1246_70322401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1246_49302501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1246.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1246_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0592.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0710.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1246_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1027.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1246_49302501.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1381.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1257.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback