MD HB1244 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each local board of elections to report certain information to the State Board of Elections on or before January 15 each year regarding certain voters who are placed into inactive status and certain voters who are removed from the statewide voter registration list; requiring the State Board to compile and summarize the data reported by the local boards in a report and publish the report on the State Board's website on or before February 1 each year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Voter Registration List Maintenance - Reporting (Voter Registration Security Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-02-21HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law3501(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3502(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3503(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3507(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback