MD HB1243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that motor scooter sharing companies include on each motor scooter a tactile phone number through which an individual who is blind or visually impaired may contact the company; and requiring that motor scooter sharing companies provide individuals with disabilities certain nonvisual access to their websites and mobile applications that is consistent with certain federal standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {290219/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback