MD HB1242 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program in the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation to provide loans to qualified commercial fishermen to continue commercial operations in the State; providing, beginning July 1, 2025, that generational watermen, beginner watermen, and seafood processing businesses are eligible to receive loans under the Program; requiring a loan made under the Program to be at least $7,000 and not more than $15,000; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] |
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB826 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Subjects
Appropriations
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Debt Management
Economic Development
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Loans
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Debt Management
Economic Development
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Loans
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Natural Resources
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1242?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1242f.pdf |