MD HB1242 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a solar photovoltaic recycling fee; requiring a person installing a solar electric generating facility in the State to pay the fee beginning October 1, 2018; establishing the Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Fund; requiring 20% of the first sale price of each renewable energy credit sold to be deposited into the Fund; providing the purpose of the Fund is to provide funding for technologies and processes that assist with the recycling of solar photovoltaic systems; etc.
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Industry and Technology
Prices
Recycling
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Industry and Technology
Prices
Recycling
Revenue and Taxes
Utilities
Utility Regulation