MD HB1240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include a certain appropriation in the Fiscal 2021 budget for merit pay increases for certain permanent employees in the Executive Branch of State government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel – Merit Pay

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (96-41)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {484367/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback