MD HB1238 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to distribute certain fees in a certain manner; requiring an account holder of the Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan to be a State resident and file taxes before July 15 each year to qualify for a State contribution; requiring a qualified beneficiary to be under the age of 26 years to receive a State contribution; prohibiting an account holder from qualifying for more than $9,000 of State contributions through a certain time period; etc.
Title
Maryland 529 Program - Board Authority and State Contribution - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB779 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19A-04.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |