MD HB1238 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each institution of higher education, beginning in the 2018-2019 academic year, to annually provide certain sexual assault response training to certain employees, contractors, or enrolled students who may be involved in certain actions; requiring each institution of higher education to provide certain training for a minimum of 8 hours to certain employees; authorizing the institution of higher education to combine certain required training; requiring certain training to include certain information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-07HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback