MD HB1236 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to engage in good-faith negotiations with certain jurisdictions and train companies to reach an agreement on a pilot program to establish Maryland Area Regional Commuter train service between Union Station in the District of Columbia and Alexandria Station, Virginia; requiring the Administration to engage in negotiations with Delaware and certain train companies to reach an agreement on a pilot program to establish train service between Perryville, Maryland and Newark, Delaware; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (111-20)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {879430/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-17SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (107-27)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {920310/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback