MD HB1236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain employers to have a certificate of pay equity compliance issued by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; requiring a custodian of public records to deny the inspection of the part of a public record that contains certain data related to equal pay certificates; prohibiting certain units from entering into a certain contract unless a certain employer has a certain certificate; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Contracts - Certification of Pay Equity Compliance - Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2019-02-19HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-18HouseReassigned to Economic Matters
2019-02-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback