MD HB1236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum grant amount that the Maryland Energy Administration may award to certain properties under the Solar Energy Grant Program; prohibiting the Administration from denying a grant application for a certain property except under certain circumstances; and establishing the maximum grant amount of $3,000 for a building with not more than 5 dwelling units.
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937570/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873395/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Utility Regulation
Alternative Energy Sources
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Utility Regulation