MD HB1234 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1349

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Wages of Education Support Professionals to determine what percentage of education support professionals in the State earn a living wage and to study increasing the wages of education support professionals to attract and retain skilled workers; and requiring the Workgroup to submit its final report of its findings and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly by August 31, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup to Study the Wages of Education Support Professionals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-07HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2023-03-07HouseHearing canceled (Ways and Means)
2023-03-07HouseHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2023-03-06HouseRereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
2023-02-15HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB735 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
HB1349 (Carry Over) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback