MD HB1234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain invitations to bid and requests for proposals by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services beginning on a certain date to require that each contractor provide documentation at the time the bid or proposal is submitted showing that at least 30% of its employees are ex-offenders; requiring certain procurement contracts to include a certain ex-offender employment clause; specifying the contents of the ex-offender employment clause; etc.
Title
Procurement - Correctional Facilities - Ex-Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-03-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Contractors
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Fines
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Procurement
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Fines
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Procurement
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment