MD HB1234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain invitations to bid and requests for proposals by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services beginning on a certain date to require that each contractor provide documentation at the time the bid or proposal is submitted showing that at least 30% of its employees are ex-offenders; requiring certain procurement contracts to include a certain ex-offender employment clause; specifying the contents of the ex-offender employment clause; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Correctional Facilities - Ex-Offenders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-03-04HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback