MD HB1232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a credit against the State income tax, under certain circumstances, for certain taxpayers who incur certain qualified expenses for certain costs to purchase or acquire certain qualified child care property or who, during the taxable year, incur certain operational costs to provide child care services for the taxpayer's employees or to compensate certain child care providers; providing that the credit may not exceed a certain amount; allowing for the carryforward of the credit under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credits - Employer Child Care Centers and Employer-Provided Child Care Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-03-05HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10751(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10752(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback