MD HB1231 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for authorization for a minor to marry; altering the conditions under which an individual who is 17 years old is authorized to marry; prohibiting an individual under the age of 17 years from marrying; requiring an applicant for a marriage license to provide a certain document to a clerk of the court; requiring a clerk of the court to review a certain order before issuing a marriage license under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (99-32)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {582512/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB949 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law1201(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2301(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2402(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law2405(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5-2A4(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback