MD HB1231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a certain remedy for the payment of an undisputed amount owed under a construction contract applies to certain retention proceeds; reducing from $250,000 to $100,000 the minimum contract amount for the purpose of the applicability of certain provisions of law relating to retention proceeds; and requiring undisputed retention proceeds retained by an owner be paid within 90 days after the date of substantial completion.
Title
Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator West) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {803327/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until next session (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743696/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |