MD HB123 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the health care services the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, is required to provide through telehealth; requiring that certain services provided under the Program include counseling and treatment; prohibiting the Program from excluding from coverage a behavioral health care service provided to a recipient in person solely because the service may be provided through telehealth; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to submit a certain report on telehealth; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Floor Amendment 663925/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70
2021-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2021-04-07HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {597079/1 Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-11HouseFloor Amendment {663925/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (43-94)
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {786887/1 Adopted
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2020-10-13HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB3 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2020(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General15103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General15105.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General15141.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15139(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0123?ys=2021RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0123f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0123t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0123e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_70_hb0123e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0123_78688701.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0123_66392501.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0123_59707901.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0123_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0123_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0375.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0420.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0864.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1174.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback