MD HB123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "team" as it relates to real estate brokerage services to mean two or more licensed associate real estate brokers or licensed real estate salespersons or any combination thereof who work together on a regular basis to provide real estate brokerage services, represent themselves to the public as being part of one entity, and designate themselves by a collective name such as team or group or by using the words "and associates".
Title
Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers – Provision of Real Estate Brokerage Services Through a Team – Use of “and Associates”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463494/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |