MD HB1229 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 450
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a certain document through the execution of which a certain individual may decide the disposition of the individual's own body without certain consent includes a document designating a person to act as an authorizing agent; providing that an authorizing agent is bound by certain documents in making certain decisions; and clarifying the order of priority of persons that have the right to serve as the authorizing agent for a decedent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 450
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB528 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 451

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General5408.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5508(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5509(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations7101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations7410(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback