MD HB1229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Restorative Schools Fund to provide grants to local school systems and individual schools for training on and implementation and evaluation of restorative approaches that build and sustain positive learning communities; requiring the State Department of Education, under certain circumstances, to develop processes and procedures for a local school system or an individual school to apply for a certain grant and for awarding a certain grant; etc.
Title
Restorative Schools Fund and Grants - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Alice Cain [D] | Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] | Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] |
Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {815366/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Construction
Counselors
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Governor
Grants
Interest
Investments
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Mentors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
School Administration
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Volunteers
Budgets
Comptroller
Construction
Counselors
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Governor
Grants
Interest
Investments
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Mentors
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
School Administration
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Volunteers