MD HB1229 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a landowner, without the approval of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, to erect and display on land subject to a certain easement a certain sign or outdoor advertising display for a certain purpose; authorizing the Foundation to authorize a landowner to erect and display on land subject to a certain easement a certain sign or outdoor advertising display for the purpose of providing certain information; providing that the Act supersedes certain provisions of a certain deed or agreement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-1)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {450413/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback