MD HB1226 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a school bus be routed with the intent that the number of pupils on the bus does not exceed the manufacturer's rated seating capacity for the bus; and providing that if an emergency or temporary situation causes the number of pupils on the bus to exceed the seating capacity, the situation shall be corrected within a reasonable period of time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseMotion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {850612/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation211118(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback