MD HB1225 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring the intent of the General Assembly to codify a certain federal regulation concerning preemption of local regulation of amateur radio station antenna structures; establishing certain requirements that apply to a county or municipal ordinance regulating amateur radio station antenna structures; applying the Act to all counties and municipalities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11314(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback