MD HB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to submit a report on or before April 30 each year to the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on computer science courses offered in public schools in the county in the prior school year; requiring each county board to include certain information in the report and post certain data on its website; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Certifications
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
internet
Language
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Open Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Social Services
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
internet
Language
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Open Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Social Services
Special Education
Students
Teachers