MD HB1224 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Program to focus on preventing and ending youth homelessness in the State and addressing disparities based on race, ethnicity, sexual orientation, and gender identity; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Program and provide funds to housing and supportive services for at risk and unaccompanied homeless youth; establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Fund to provide funds for the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-2)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {824661/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback