MD HB1224 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Program to focus on preventing and ending youth homelessness in the State and addressing disparities based on race, ethnicity, sexual orientation, and gender identity; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer the Program and provide funds to housing and supportive services for at risk and unaccompanied homeless youth; establishing the Ending Youth Homelessness Grant Fund to provide funds for the Program; etc.
Title
Ending Youth Homelessness Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {824661/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Data
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
Treasurers
Youth
Comptroller
Data
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
Treasurers
Youth