MD HB1220 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a public-private partnership agreement for a project involving road, highway, or bridge assets from establishing or altering toll rates, a range of toll rates, a formula or algorithm to determine fluctuating toll rates, or any late payment fees unless approved by the Board of Public Works.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (96-33)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {220819/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement10A401(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback