MD HB1220 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Inspector General or a specified Assistant Inspector General in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to subpoena any person or evidence, administer oaths, and take depositions and other testimony for the purpose of investigating fraud, waste, or abuse of departmental program funds; authorizing a specified court to take specified actions under specified circumstances if a person fails to comply with a specified order or subpoena; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {556387/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Abuse
Appeals
Auditors and Audits
Civil Actions
Claims
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Evidence
Federal Government
Fines
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Process Serving
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Subpoenas
Witnesses
Appeals
Auditors and Audits
Civil Actions
Claims
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Evidence
Federal Government
Fines
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Process Serving
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Subpoenas
Witnesses