MD HB1218 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to administer the Clean Energy Workforce Account; requiring the Department to award grants from the Account in accordance with certain provisions of law; requiring the Department to develop certain application guidelines; and requiring the Department, in developing the application guidelines, to provide opportunity for certain individuals to review and comment on the guidelines and incorporate certain comments into the guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB785 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment11708.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback