MD HB1217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to prescribe and dispense aids for the cessation of the use of tobacco products; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2020, to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide coverage for certain services rendered by a licensed pharmacist under the Act to the same extent as certain services rendered by any other licensed health care practitioner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback