MD HB1214 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to give due consideration to the effect of a generating station, overhead transmission line, or qualified generator lead line on the preservation of environmental quality and the climate before taking final action on an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Preservation of Environmental Quality and the Climate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB538 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback