MD HB1213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain circumstances under which an individual who has been convicted of a crime is not qualified for jury service; and repealing a provision specifying that an individual is not qualified for jury service if the individual has a certain charge pending for a certain crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (93-39)
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings8103(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback