MD HB1211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Pre-Seed Builder Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation as a special, nonlapsing fund to support the development of start-up companies run by entrepreneurs from socially or economically disadvantaged backgrounds that hinder access to traditional forms of capital and executive networks at the pre-seed stage; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a certain appropriation to the Fund; providing for the investment of money in the Fund; etc.
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 415 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-9) |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Minorities
Poverty
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Minorities
Poverty
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 473 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |