MD HB1210 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 5 @ 1:00 pm House Ways and Means Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB146 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-10 - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10208(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10308(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback