MD HB121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB594
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1201
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Reparations Commission; providing for the composition, staffing, chair and vice chair, and terms of the members of the Commission; providing that the purpose of the Commission is to develop and administer a program for the provision of compensatory benefits to the descendants of individuals enslaved in the State; providing that any individual whose ancestors were enslaved in the State is eligible to receive benefits administered by the Commission; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
State Government - Maryland Reparations Commission - Establishment (Harriet Tubman Community Investment Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB121 (Carry Over) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1201 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1201 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Archives
Banks and Trust Companies
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Forms
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Human Relations
Minorities
Notices
Reparations
Rules and Regulations
Archives
Banks and Trust Companies
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Forms
Higher Education
Historical Matters
Human Relations
Minorities
Notices
Reparations
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0121?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0121f.pdf |