MD HB1209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a State Tax Sale Ombudsman in the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to withhold from tax sale a dwelling owned by a homeowner who meets certain criteria; requiring certain notices sent to property owners whose properties are subject to tax sale to include a certain summary of the tax sale process and certain information concerning the State Tax Sale Ombudsman; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-27) (Y: 110 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-35) (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {923928/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (44-89) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {633320/1 (Delegate Cardin) Rejected (38-90) (Y: 39 N: 91 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (110-27)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
2019-04-08SenateSpecial Order until next session (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {349530/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-20SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (96-35)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {923928/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (44-89)
2019-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {633320/1 (Delegate Cardin) Rejected (38-90)
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {625762/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1209&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1209f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1209t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1209e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1209_62576201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1209_63332001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1209_92392801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1209_34953001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb1209.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1209_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0540.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0541.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0598.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1209_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1577.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1396.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback