MD HB1209 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a law enforcement agency, with regard to a missing person, to enter all necessary and available information into the National Crime Information Center computer network within 2 hours after receipt of the minimum information necessary to make the entry; and requiring the Department of State Police to place a direct link to the Internet site of the Maryland Center for Missing and Unidentified Persons on the home page of the Department's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – Missing Persons – Information (Eula and Danny’s Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {512815/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback