MD HB1208 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-21 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-21 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2022; and terminating the Act after September 30, 2022.
Title
Task Force to Study Academic Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-21 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Data
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
School Testing
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Data
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Reports
School Testing
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1208?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1208f.pdf |