MD HB1208 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, to provide mental health services appropriately delivered through telehealth to a patient in the patient's home setting; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply, on or before December 1, 2020, to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to certain waivers to implement a pilot program to provide certain telehealth services to recipients under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth – Mental Health and Chronic Condition Management Services – Coverage and Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-18SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {186884/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General15141.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance15139(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback