MD HB1207 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the placement of more than two children in a treatment foster care home in order to place siblings together if the local department makes a written finding that placing the siblings together is in their best interests and that the siblings will not harm other children placed at the same treatment foster care home; and requiring the local department to notify the Social Services Administration of the Department of Human Resources of the placement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Treatment Foster Care Homes - Siblings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492
2017-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2017-04-10HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2017-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {798877/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {322312/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1207&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1207f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1207t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1207e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_492_hb1207e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1207_32231201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1207_79887701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1207.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1207_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1207_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1207,h-0420&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1207,h-1466&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1207,s-1319&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback