MD HB1204 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback