MD HB1200 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB327

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a minimum training course compensation of $50 and minimum daily compensation of $250 for election judges for each election day and each early voting day actually served; requiring the State Board of Elections to reimburse each local board elections for $50 of the extra compensation that is paid to each returning election judge; and requiring the State Board to develop and implement a marketing campaign to assist in the recruitment of individuals to serve as election judges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections - Election Judges - Minimum Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Floor Amendment 223323/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 98 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157
2023-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2023-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (129-10)
2023-04-10HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2023-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2023-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {803720/1 Adopted
2023-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-16SenateReferred Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (121-16)
2023-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {223323/1 (Delegate Tomlinson) Rejected (37-98)
2023-03-14HouseMotion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Tomlinson) Adopted
2023-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {283623/1 Adopted
2023-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2023-02-13HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

HB327 (Carry Over) 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
SB925 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Rereferred to Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law10205(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1200?ys=2023RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb1200f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb1200t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb1200e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/Chapters_noln/CH_157_hb1200e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1200_28362301.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1200_22332301.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1200_80372001.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb1200_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb1200_eee.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0330.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0436.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/1338.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/1245.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback