MD HB1200 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a homeowner to have a homestead property tax credit application on file with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation in order to be eligible for a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax to offset certain increases in local income tax revenues; providing that any increase in county property tax revenue that results from the Act may not be counted toward a certain county limitation on county property tax revenue; applying the Act to taxable years after June 30, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-10SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (129-5)
2020-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {445763/1 Adopted
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9221(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback