MD HB1200 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with interested stakeholders, to review conflicts that arise related to aquaculture and submerged aquatic vegetation, develop specified solutions to these conflicts, and report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2017; requiring the Department, notwithstanding specified provisions of law, to adopt regulations that establish standards and a process by which the Department may assess and evaluate specified aquaculture leases for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-1) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-1) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381 |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994739/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-1) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Emergency Bills
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Emergency Bills
Hunting and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations