MD HB120 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the Seafood Marketing and Aquaculture Development Program, the Seafood Marketing Fund, the Seafood Program Management Team, the Innovative Seafood Technologies Program, and the Seafood Marketing Advisory Commission from the Department of Natural Resources to the Department of Agriculture; establishing the Seafood and Aquaculture Products Marketing Fund to facilitate the marketing of seafood and aquaculture products; naming the Department of Agriculture as the lead agency for the marketing of aquaculture products; etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {290418/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Aquaculture
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Names
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Aquaculture
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Names
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes