MD HB120 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Anne Arundel, Baltimore, Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties and Baltimore City; and increasing the number of resident judges of the District Court in District 5 (Prince George's County) and District 6 (Montgomery County).
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2014-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Charles County
Circuit Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Judges
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Charles County
Circuit Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Judges
Montgomery County
Prince George's County