MD HB12 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the scope of a certain provision prohibiting the retail delivery to a purchaser of alcoholic beverages under certain circumstances; providing that certain authorization for the holders of certain licenses to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption in a certain manner applies only in a jurisdiction where the local licensing board had adopted certain regulations; authorizing the holders of certain licenses to sell certain alcoholic beverages in sealed containers for off-premises consumption or delivery; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {503925/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2021-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Report {503925/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Simonaire, Pinsky and Washington) |
2021-04-02 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Simonaire, Pinsky and Washington) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, T. Branch and C. Watson) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-02 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, T. Branch and C. Watson) |
2021-04-01 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-04-01 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464133/1 Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-4) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343594/1 Adopted |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB205 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Subjects
Age
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Delivery Services
Fees
Identification
Registration
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Sunset
Time
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Delivery Services
Fees
Identification
Registration
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |